CA SB493 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 30061 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 749.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to local government financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government financing: juvenile justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20SenateMay 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 861.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-05SenateApril 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code30061Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code749.22Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback