CA SB492 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5540.2 of the Public Resources Code, relating to park and open-space districts.
Title
Midpeninsula Regional Open Space District: purchase of property: San Jose Water Company.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 492 Beall Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do p" class="columnField" style="text-align:left"> (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB492 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do p" class="columnField" style="text-align:left"> (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB492 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 2850.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | July 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and U. & E. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 952.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 727.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5540.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |