CA SB489 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 300, 302, 303, 306, 306.5, 350, 354, 357, 358, 359, 360, 421, 423, 426, 500.5, 501, 502, 503, 504, 506, 510, and 511 of, and to add Part 6 (Commencing with Section 570) to Division 3 of, the Family Code, to amend Sections 26840, 26840.1, 26840.3, and 26840.7 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 102225, 102285, 102310, 102325, 102355, 102356, 103235, 103426, 103431, 103435, and 103443 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 360 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 18293, 18305, 18308, 18309, and 18309.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to marriage.
Title
Marriage licenses and certificates.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |