CA SB489 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12687.5 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Flood management projects: state funding: Pajaro River Flood Risk Management Project.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB489 Laird et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-16 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 489 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Laird (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-16 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 489 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Laird (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4899.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4853.) |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4809.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5827.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1006.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 552.) (March 18). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12687.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |