CA SB488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 927, 927.1, and 927.2 of, to amend the heading of Article 10.2 (commencing with Section 927) of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 1 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 927.3 of, and to add Section 12962.5 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurers: data reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB488 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1248.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1080.) (May 15).
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (April 26).
2017-03-03SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code927Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code927.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code927.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code927.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback