CA SB486 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12814.5 and 12816 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Driver’s licenses: renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | April 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 942.) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12814.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12816 | Amended Code | Citation Text |