CA SB485 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1011 of, and to add Sections 1011.1 and 1011.2 to, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans’ homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB485 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1185.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 746.) (April 18).
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 540.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1010Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1011Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1011.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code1011.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code1011.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code1012Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1012.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1012.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1012.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1012.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1014Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1015Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1023Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1024Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1033.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1034Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1035.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1038Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1038.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1044Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1051Repealed CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code79.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Military and Veterans Code79.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback