CA SB484 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7197 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to home inspections.
Title
Home inspections: sewer lateral repairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 484 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB484 Archuleta (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB484 Archuleta (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 545, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 2685.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 8). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7197 | Amended Code | Citation Text |