CA SB483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-27 - Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1808.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to motor vehicles.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles: records: confidentiality.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB483 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | July 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 916.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1808.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |