CA SB480 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-24 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-24 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 126.7 of, and to add Section 14 to, the Metropolitan Water District Act (Chapter 209 of the Statutes of 1969), relating to water.
Title
Metropolitan Water District of Southern California: rules: inappropriate conduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB480 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB480 Stern (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Arambula. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Arambula. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Arambula. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1419.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.138 | New Code | See Bill Text |