CA SB48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65583 of, and to add and repeal Article 12 (commencing with Section 65660) of Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Low Barrier Navigation Center developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 843.) (April 24).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 713.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 551.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HOUSING, GOV. & F., and EQ.
2019-03-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65583Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65660New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback