CA SB478 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4747 to the Civil Code, and to amend Section 65585 of, and to add Section 65913.11 to, the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and Zoning Law: housing development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB478 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 478 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB478 Wiener (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 478 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB478 Wiener (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2557.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 2916.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 1258.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1193.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 987.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 728.) (April 8). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4747 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65913.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |