CA SB474 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2787, 2791, and 2796 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to wildlife, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The California Wildlife Protection Act of 1990: Habitat Conservation Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-01SenateApril 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code2787Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2791Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2796Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10500Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback