CA SB472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22105, 22105.2, 22154, 22162, and 22706 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 22001, 22007, 22101, 22101.5, 22102, 22103, 22106, 22107, 22109, 22151, 22152, 22153, 22155, 22156, 22157, 22159, 22161, 22163, 22164, 22168, 22169, 22700, 22701, 22712, 22714, and 22716 of, to add Sections 22018.5, 22100.3, 22104.5, and 22112.5 to, to add and repeal Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 22480) of Division 9 of, and to add and repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 22790) of Chapter 4 of Division 9 of, the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wage-based, work-based, and income-based advances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB472 Caballero (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 3066.)
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2019-08-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-12Assembly(Received at desk July 19 pursuant to JR 61(a)(11)).
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-07-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
2019-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1028.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30).
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10).
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code2176Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22001Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22007New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22018.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22050Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22100.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22101Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22101.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22102Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22103Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22104.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22105Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22105.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22106Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22107Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22109Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22112.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22151Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22152Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22153Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22154Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22155Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22156Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22157Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22159Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22161Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22162Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22163Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22164Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22168Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22169Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22480Repealed CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22700Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22701Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22706Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22712Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22714Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22716Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code60000New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback