CA SB471 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39712 of the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 25229 to the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 189.5 to the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water, energy, and reduction of greenhouse gas emissions: planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB471 Pavley (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom Assembly without further action.
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2015-08-27AssemblyAugust 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2015-08-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2015-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-08-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2015-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2015-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1302.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1154.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-18SenateMay 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2015-05-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 29).
2015-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2015-04-14SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2015-04-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-04-08SenateApril 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2015-03-18SenateSet for hearing April 14.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
2015-02-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
2015-02-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39712Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39950New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25229New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code75214.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code10537Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10538Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code189.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code79746.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_471&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150413_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150505_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150602_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150707_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_bill_20150817_amended_asm_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_vote_20150429_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_vote_20150603_0607PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_vote_20150518_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_471_vote_20150713_000001_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback