CA SB470 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.56 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
The Mobilehome Residency Law: tenancy: termination.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-03-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 2 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 945.) Reconsideration granted. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |