CA SB47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Set for hearing April 2.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Hearing: Apr 2 @ 9:30 am in Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 101, 104, 9008, 9105, 9203, and 18600 of, and to add Sections 107 and 108 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiative, referendum, and recall petitions: disclosures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code104Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code107New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code108New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code18600Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9008Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9105Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9203Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback