CA SB47 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30515 and 30900 of, and to add Section 30680 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: assault weapons.
Sponsors
Sen. Leland Yee [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB47 Yee (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Special Order SB47 Yee (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 18. |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 30515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30680 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |