CA SB469 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19530 of, and to add Section 19481.7 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Horse racing: health and safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Assembly - SB 469 Dodd Third Reading Urgency By Gray (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB469 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB469 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB469 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB469 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1727.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2400.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Gray. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19481.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19530 | Amended Code | Citation Text |