CA SB468 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8558 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
State of emergency: local emergency: electromagnetic pulse attack.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB468 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 468 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-27 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB468 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 468 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-27 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Emergency Management] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB468 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5827.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1060.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |