CA SB467 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 982, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 982, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1473 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Expert witnesses: writ of habeas corpus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB467 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 467 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Mia Bonta (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB467 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-13-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 467 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Mia Bonta (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB467 Wiener et al (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-13-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 982, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5314.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 2822.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20). |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2747.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 11. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | April 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 777.) Reconsideration granted. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1473 | Amended Code | Citation Text |