CA SB466 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1939.23 of the Civil Code, relating to rental passenger vehicle transactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental passenger vehicle transactions: electronic surveillance technology: AMBER Alert.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 466 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB466 Bates et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-06-05AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1143.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenatePublished May 9 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 945.) (May 2).
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1939.23Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback