CA SB464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 18930 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Food Assistance Program: eligibility and benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB464 Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1192.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-03-10SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18930New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback