CA SB462 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8686 of the Government Code, relating to disaster relief, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disaster relief: Creek Fire: allocation to local agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20SenateMay 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-03-22SenateMarch 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 420.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 9.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8686Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback