CA SB459 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 86114, 86116, 86117, and 86118 of, and to add Section 86119 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: lobbying.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 459 Allen Senate Third Reading By Mullin (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB459 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB459 Allen et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB459 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB459 Allen et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5419.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for second hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-08-24 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1192.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 915.) (April 26). |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 86114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86119 | New Code | See Bill Text |