CA SB458 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20125, 20150.7, and 20169 of, and to add Article 1.9 (commencing with Section 20104.90) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: Local Agency Public Construction Act: reporting and notifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20104.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20150.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |