CA SB456 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50675.1.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Multifamily Housing Program: nonprofit corporations: homeless or at-risk youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB456 Menjivar et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB456 Menjivar et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-19 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1299.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1171.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 452.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and HUMAN S. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50675.1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |