CA SB455 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 2968) to Chapter 2 of Title 14 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
State of emergency: mortgage servicers: disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent SB455 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Assembly - SB 455 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB455 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Assembly - SB 455 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB455 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 873, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2830.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1408.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From consent calendar on motion of Senator McGuire. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 2). |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2968 | New Code | See Bill Text |