CA SB454 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Set for hearing April 23.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 9:30 am in Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1110 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Water Resources Control Board: Administrative Hearing Office: fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-18SenateMarch 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code1110Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback