CA SB452 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 12800 and 65050 of, and to add and repeal Article 15 (commencing with Section 12839) of Chapter 1 of Part 2.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: Immigrant and Refugee Affairs Agency: Office of Immigrant and Refugee Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB452 Gonzalez et al (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-30AssemblyJune 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1192.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 936.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 588.) (March 23).
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-03-15SenateReferral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O., JUD., and HUMAN S.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12800Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65050Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback