CA SB452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14536, 14571.6, 14571.8, 14581, and 14585 of, and to add and repeal Sections 14549.2, 14572.3, and 14575.2 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to beverage containers, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB452 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-18AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-21AssemblyJune 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback