CA SB447 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 377.34 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: decedent’s cause of action.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB447 Laird Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 447 Laird Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB447 Laird (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 447 Laird Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB447 Laird (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 2721.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 972.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 20). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 377.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |