CA SB443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.8 of, and to add Sections 1797.91 and 1797.232 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency medical services (EMS): prehospital EMS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB443 Hertzberg (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB443 Hertzberg (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1091.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 915.) (April 26). |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1798.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |