CA SB443 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 647, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 647, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4119 of, and to add Sections 4034.5, 4119.01, and 4202.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacy: emergency medical services automated drug delivery system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB443 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 443 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB443 Hernandez et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 443 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB443 Hernandez et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 647, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2893.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3269.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 913.) (May 1). |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4034.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4119.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4202.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |