CA SB442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 670, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 670, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7195 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 115922 and 115925 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: pools: drownings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB442 Newman et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 442 Newman Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB442 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 442 Newman Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB442 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 670, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2836.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 3161.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 23). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1135.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 751.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | (Corrected March 21). |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7195 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115922 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |