CA SB440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 19 (commencing with Section 18999.9) to Part 6 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to cognitive impairment.
Title
Cognitive Impairment Safety Net System Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 491.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18999.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |