CA SB439 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 734, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 734, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2170 and 13004 of, and to add Sections 303.4, 2550, and 13004.5 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Election procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB439 Allen Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 439 Allen Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB439 Allen (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Assembly - SB 439 Allen Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB439 Allen (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 734, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2497.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2856.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 960.) (May 11). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 13004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2550 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 303.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |