CA SB436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18951, 18958, and 18961.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Office of Child Abuse Prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB436 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 436 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 436 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 476, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2327.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Flora. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18958 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18961.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |