CA SB435 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 27202.1 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: pollution control devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB435 Pavley (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Assembly - SB 435 Pavley Senate Third Reading By HILL (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB435 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2010.
2010-09-28 Approved by Governor.
2010-09-03 Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
2010-08-30 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 5008.) To enrollment.
2010-08-23 From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4807.)
2010-08-20 Set for hearing August 23.
2010-08-19 From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4627.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2010-08-19 Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
2010-08-18 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2010-08-18 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 6338.) To Senate.
2010-08-10 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-08-09 Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
2010-08-05 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
2010-06-30 Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2010-06-29 From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
2010-06-22 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2010-06-21 Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2010-06-15 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2010-06-10 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2010-01-11 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2009-06-29 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-06-08 To Com. on TRANS.
2009-06-01 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-06-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 1108.) To Assembly.
2009-05-28 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1071.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
2009-05-22 Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
2009-04-27 Placed on APPR suspense file.
2009-04-17 Set for hearing April 27.
2009-04-15 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-13 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-03-25 Set for hearing April 14.
2009-03-12 To Com. on T. & H.
2009-02-27 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
2009-02-26 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_435&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20090226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20090413_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20090528_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100111_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100610_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100615_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100622_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100630_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100809_amended_asm_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_bill_20100928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20090414_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20090427_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20090528_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20090601_0334PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20100628_000007_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20100804_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20100818_0254PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20100823_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_435_vote_20100830_0242PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback