CA SB434 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4576 to the Penal Code, relating to correctional facilities.
Title
Correctional facilities: wireless communication devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Florez [D] | Asm. Danny Gilmore [R] | Sen. Tom Harman [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB434 Benoit (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB434 Benoit (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-27 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-07-01 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-06-23 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |
2009-06-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-21 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-29 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |