CA SB433 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 643, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 643, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 30821.3 to the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
California Coastal Act of 1976: enforcement: penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB433 Allen Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 433 Allen Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB433 Allen (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 433 Allen Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB433 Allen (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 643, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2557.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2916.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1191.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 27). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 30821.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |