CA SB432 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5100, 5105, 5115, and 5200 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 7511 of the Corporations Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB432 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 432 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Chen (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB432 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 432 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Chen (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB432 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2811.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 7511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |