CA SB431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 776.2 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Telecommunications service: backup electrical supply rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB431 McGuire (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB431 McGuire (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | (Corrected February 11). |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 922.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 771.) (April 23). |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 776.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |