CA SB43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - July 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - July 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38561.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Carbon intensity and pricing: retail products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Allen (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Allen (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1088.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 845.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |