CA SB43 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14087.51 of, and to add Section 14087.511 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County health systems: County of San Mateo: dental care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Hill et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-07-11AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-30SenateApril 5 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-27SenateMarch 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-01-31SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-01-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback