CA SB428 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 219 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to jurors.
Title
Juries: peace officer exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2015-05-13 | Senate | May 12 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 983.) |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |