CA SB427 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 238, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 238, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116885 of, and to add Section 116890 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Public water systems: community water systems: lead user service lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 427 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB427 Leyva (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB427 Leyva (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 238, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Published May 15 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 784.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116890 | New Code | See Bill Text |