CA SB426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 16519.75) of Chapter 5 of Part 4 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child abuse prevention.
Title
Community-based home visitation pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB426 Pan (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB426 Pan (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 2 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 850.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | April 4 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18994.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |