CA SB425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 849, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 849, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 800, 2221, and 2234 of, and to add Section 805.8 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Health care practitioners: licensee’s file: probationary physician’s and surgeon’s certificate: unprofessional conduct.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB425 Hill Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 425 Hill Senate Third Reading By Gallagher (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB425 Hill (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 425 Hill Senate Third Reading By Gallagher (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB425 Hill (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 849, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2850.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3319.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1099.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 798.) (April 23). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 805.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |