CA SB422 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 35100, 35101, 35103, 35120, 35152, and 35153 of, to amend the heading of Division 26 (commencing with Section 35100) of, and to add Section 35122 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to the Santa Clara Valley Open-Space Authority.
Title
Santa Clara Valley Open-Space Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB422 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - SB 422 Monning Senate Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB422 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - SB 422 Monning Senate Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB422 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2173.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 843.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 725.) (April 22). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 35100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 35152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |